U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10483-
  • Case Name: DONALD SHANE GIBSON and GISELA WOOLFOLK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [oVacating Discharge Due to Administrative Error - VAN Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.