U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-11030-
  • Case Name: HENRY GONZALEZ GONZALES and PAMALA GENE GONZALES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Withdrawal]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Objection to Exempt Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.