U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02455-
  • Case Name: ANA CLAUDIA OZUNA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [11 CREDITOR - Request for Notice (batch) (no document)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.