U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10852-
  • Case Name: CHARLES ALEXANDER LAPOSE, JR. and KATHLEEN ANN DUBIN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Change of Address]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.