U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02475-
  • Case Name: Sheryl A. Flockhart
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Summary of Schedules]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Schedules]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.