U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02472-
  • Case Name: 1981 LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.