U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00022-PS
  • Case Name: RICHARD L STERWALD and CATHERINE P STERWALD
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Held on Scheduled Date and Concluded (batch)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Mandatory Electronic Filing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Amendment to Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.