U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-00113-
  • Case Name: LASHINSKY v. BOYD et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oSetting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Form]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued (Form) ]
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 24, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.