U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-01465-
  • Case Name: EDWARD LEO BOHANICK and JILL RAE BOHANICK
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oDismissing Case]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oExtend]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Extend (Motion to)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.