U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10972-
  • Case Name: CIMARRON GARRETT LAYNE CURRY and TERESA MARIE CURRY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Reaffirmation Hearing (Form)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Reaffirmation Agreement - Pro Se Debtor]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Final Installment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.