U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-08719-
  • Case Name: WILLIAM KESHISHI and LINET MIRZAKHANIAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Objection]
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Recommendation Amended or Modified Plan (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oRuling on Objection to Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.