U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00756-
  • Case Name: MARK ALLEN PHILPOTT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [oEmploy (Application to)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Employ (Application to)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Appearance (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.