U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-02498-
  • Case Name: GREGG A. MARTINEZ and JESSICA MARTINEZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Objection to Confirmation]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Request for Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.