U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02494-
  • Case Name: DANIEL LEWIS BROCKERT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Creditors re: Chapter 7 Current Monthly Income Not Filed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Request for Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.