U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-ap-00117-
  • Case Name: Unique Motorsports Auto Sales, LLC v. LIZARRAGA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default Form]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Notice of Submitting]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Declaration of Attorney]
  • April 15, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [Entry of Default (Application for)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 4 Chapter: [oPotential Dismissal of Adversary - VAN Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.