U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-01418-
  • Case Name: SCOTT HOWARD HOFFMAN and JENN AERYN HOFFMAN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Appearance (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors Held on Scheduled Date and Concluded]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.