U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02510-PS
  • Case Name: Brenda Young
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Application for Access to Electronic Drop Box and Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oWaiving Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Debtor Application to Waive Payment of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [DeBN Debtor Electronic Noticing Request]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Declaration Regarding Electronic Submission (eSR only)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.