U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-11075-
  • Case Name: DANIEL R RICHARDS, III and JASMIN N RICHARDS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Employ (Application to)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Withdrawal]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice of Hearing - VAN Form]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Objection]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Turnover (Motion for)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Redemption of Personal Property (Motion for)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BIRDSELL, DAVID A. [Redemption of Personal Property (Motion for)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.