U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-01137-
  • Case Name: Joseph Eros
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Change of Address]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [oRelief from Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors Held (batch)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.