U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00460-PS
  • Case Name: ALICA R CROCKETT and TERRANCE T CROCKETT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Operating Report]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Operating Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Held on Scheduled Date and Concluded (batch)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Operating Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.