U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-11115-
  • Case Name: LUIS GOMEZ GONZALEZ and DANIELLE SHENEA GONZALEZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [oApprove Compromise/Settlement]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--Notice of Claims Bar Date]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) (Motion for)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Approve Compromise/Settlement (Motion to)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.