U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02506-
  • Case Name: Leticia Esther Torres
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1 CREDITOR - Notice of Appearance/Request for Notice (batch) (document required)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Schedules]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.