U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10945-
  • Case Name: LAWRENCE LEONARD LEE and ELIZABETH ANN COSTANZO-LEE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Report of Allowed Claims (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oConfirming Chapter 13/12 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Attorney or Other Professional Compensation (Application for)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Memo - No Financial Management Course]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Amendment to Mailing List (34.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.