U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10834-
  • Case Name: DAVID ARTHUR TANNER and STARLA JUNE TANNER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Report of Allowed Claims (batch)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oConfirming Chapter 13/12 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order (batch)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Submission of Proposed Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Notice of)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.