U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-00697-PS
  • Case Name: SHIELA M BRADLEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oReinstating Case - VAN Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.