U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02534
  • Case Name: RAMON ALVARO LIZARRAGA and ISABEL LIZARRAGA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oReinstate Case]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oExtend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Extend Time to File Schedules and Statements (Motion to)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Disclosure of Compensation]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.