U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02529-
  • Case Name: PATRICK MICHAEL KEIGLEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Submitting]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.