U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-01520-
  • Case Name: WILLIAM LACEY, JR.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Response]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [audio]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Pre-Status Conference Report]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Minutes of 341 Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice of Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.