U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-03001-
  • Case Name: RALPH JOSEPH GAMBALE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Transcript and Notice of Filing (Form)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [audio]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.