U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02526-
  • Case Name: Brian Keith Majuta and Anissa Marie Majuta
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors Held (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Schedules]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [2Set Missing Filings Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: KARTCHNER, STANLEY J [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.