U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02525
  • Case Name: DANIEL ANTHONY DUVAL and MARISSA MARIANA LOPEZ-DUVAL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Appearance (Notice of)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Application for Pmt of Administrative Expense and Notc of Date to File Objection]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.