U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-01675-
  • Case Name: Lauren N Pernatozzi
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Amendment to Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Notice of Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Appearance (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.