U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-09293-
  • Case Name: RONALD A HESS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oExtend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Submission of Proposed Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Extend (Motion to)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oSustaining]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [No Objection (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Intent to Lodge Dismissal Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Withdrawal of Objection to Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.