U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-00015-
  • Case Name: Ratcliff v. CAMACHO
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [CHAP Minute Entry]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [audio]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry]
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Form (Adv & Misc)]
  • March 25, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing (Adversary/Misc Proceeding) - VAN Form]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.