U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-10774-
  • Case Name: ANTHONY ALEXIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [o~Generic~ Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Final Installment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Receipt for Overage]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: REAVES, DAVID M. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.