U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-10928-
  • Case Name: SHIRLEY ANITALEE VALDEZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [oRelief from Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.