U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02516-
  • Case Name: JEFFERY PAUL GUTTIEREZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oReinstating Case]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Vacate (Motion to)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Substitute Attorney (Motion to)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.