U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02542-
  • Case Name: STEPHANIE A HANDS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice of Filing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Minutes of 341 Meeting]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oChapter 11 Status Conference (BKM/MCW/PS Form)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Schedules]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [CHAP Virtual Minute Entry]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice of Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Employ (Application to)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Employ (Application to)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oChapter 11 Status Conference (DPC Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [oChapter 11 Status Conference (DPC Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.