U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02541-
  • Case Name: THE SERVANT GROUP, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [audio]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice of Filing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oMinute Entry Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Minutes of 341 Meeting]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Employ (Application to)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oApprove]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oSetting Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oMinute Entry Order]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [audio]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oApprove]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oAccelerate/Expedite]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Approve (Motion to)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Schedules]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oJoint Administration]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice of Filing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oSetting Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oWage Order]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oMinute Entry Order]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oAccelerate/Expedite]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oEmploy (Application to)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Joint Administration (Motion for)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Approve Use of Cash Collateral (Motion to)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Wage Order (Motion for)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Approve (Motion to)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 11 Corp/Part]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Verified Statement of Professional FRBP 2014]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney FRBP 2016]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Employ (Application to)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Employ (Application to)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [Notice of Filing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Notice of Filing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: CROSS, JAMES E. [oChapter 11 Status Conference (BKM/MCW/PS Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [oChapter 11 Status Conference (BKM/MCW/PS Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [2Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (1738.00 fee)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: ZCHAPTER, 11 FMC [List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.