U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-02538-
  • Case Name: ANDREW MURPHY PETRIE and NICHOLE MARIE PETRIE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Appearance (Notice of)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WARFIELD, LAWRENCE J. [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.