U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02546-
  • Case Name: JOSIE SALAZAR
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oReinstating Case]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Reinstate Case (Motion to)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [4Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (313.00 fee)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.