U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-03850-
  • Case Name: JORGE ROMAN ORTEGA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Recommendation (Chapter 13) (batch)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Objection to Confirmation]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: MANEY, EDWARD J. [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.