U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-bk-02870-
  • Case Name: CAPSTONE ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oGranting]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oApproving Stipulation for Settlement/Compromise Relating to Proof of Claim]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [oGranting]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Stipulation]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [CHAP Minute Entry]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [audio]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MASON, ANTHONY H. [Withdrawal (Notice of)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.