U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00595
  • Case Name: Wansor v. SunFed Produce LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 27, 2025: [Third Party Complaint ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.