U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-ap-00115-
  • Case Name: Birdsell et al v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oGranting]
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • April 28, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued (Form) ]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Request for Issuance of Summons]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.