U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-bk-01630-
  • Case Name: JESUS DANIEL MAGANA and LILLIANA MAGANA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Meeting of Creditors Held]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Amendment to Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.