U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:25-bk-02585-
  • Case Name: MAYRA DIAZ
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Request for Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee Installment]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application to)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Debtors Without an Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Preparer]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [oPay Filing Fee (80.00 Not Paid) (Chapter 7 or 11) - VAN Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [1Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 0 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Jim D [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.