U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-02583-
  • Case Name: BRETT CISZEWSKI
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Motion for Relief from Stay (Notice of)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (199.00 fee)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Appearance (Notice of)]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Initial Mailing List]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [1Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: BROWN, RUSSELL [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.