U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-02580-
  • Case Name: DUSTIN URIAH ROBERTSON and STEVIE CARAE ROBERTSON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Amendment to Schedules (D,E/F/34.00 Fee)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency/Warning Notc to Atty for No Declaration of Electronic Filing (Form)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Deficiency Memo (QC Form)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 7 Indiv/Joint]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Notice to Debtors Form]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [1Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (338.00 fee)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: GAUGHAN, MAUREEN [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.