U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-09852-
  • Case Name: FRUENZE M. PARKER
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [CHAP Minute Entry]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [audio]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [No Objection (Notice of)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Form]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Notice of Hearing - VAN Form]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MULLEN, BRIAN J. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.